Berhe v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al

Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and Quality Loan Service
Plaintiff: Meheret G. Berhe
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00552
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 5 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend in part. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 07/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 11 Order. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 27, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Berhe v. Federal National Mortgage Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meheret G. Berhe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]