Korhonen et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest

Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Plaintiff: Timothy Korhonen and Joseph Oddo, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00565
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs extra-contractual claims are DISMISSED. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 22, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 31 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to 30 Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
September 16, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 35 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' second cause of action is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 27, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 48 Motion for Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 5/14/2015 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 3, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 52 Motion to extend time for the depositions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall provide chambers a copy of 51 MOTION to Strike by 3/6/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 27, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 62 Motion to Continue Magistrate Judge Hearing re 51 Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 11, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 71 Motion to Vacate settlement conference. The settlement conference in this case is hereby VACATED. The parties shall submit a stipulation of dismissal no later than June 10, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korhonen et al v. Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Korhonen
Represented By: Michael A. Kristof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Oddo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael A. Kristof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.