Bilalyan et al v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Hermine Bilalyan and Ruth Johnson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00577
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 12/31/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 26, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Status Report. Joint Status Report re Settlement due within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 6, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a status report by March 17, 2014 advising the Court of the status of the settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 26, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the parties shall file a status report by April 7, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilalyan et al v. State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hermine Bilalyan
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Joel S Hengstler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Represented By: Joel S Hengstler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Insley-Micheri
Represented By: Ryan L Dennett
Represented By: Brian David Nettles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]