Saleh v. Holder

Respondent: Eric H Holder
Petitioner: Abdul Saleh
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00586
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1252(a)(2) Injunction for Deportation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 18 Defendant's Motion to Stay of Rule 26(f) Report and Proposed Scheduling Order in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 18, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Joint Rule 26(f) report and proposed scheduling order be filed on or before November 5, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 7, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the stay previously entered in this case due to the lapse of appropriations is hereby lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/7/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 18, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Defendant's 26(f) Report. Cross-motions for summary judgment due by 12/10/2013. Cross-opposition briefs due 1/10/14. Cross-reply briefs due 1/24/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 18, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 27 Respondent's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This matter is remanded to the USCIS to re-adjudicate the Form I-130 Petition filed by Petitioner and Teklewold on July 9, 2010 (Admin. Record 93101) in accordance with this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 16, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Permit Attorney Sarah Maloney as Government Attorney for Eric H Holder. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Saleh v. Holder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H Holder
Represented By: David Schor
Represented By: Chief Counsel ICE
Represented By: OIL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abdul Saleh
Represented By: Dan M. Winder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]