Ficken v. New Castle Corp

Defendant: New Castle Corp
Plaintiff: Danielle Ficken
Case Number: 2:2013cv00600
Filed: April 8, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 23 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Responses to 31 MOTION to Certify Class Motion for Circulation of FLSA Notice are due by 8/25/2013. This case is not stayed as to any Fed.R.Civ.Pro. 26(a) disclosures or discovery pertaining to potential employee class members who are not represented by the Culinary Union or Teamster Unions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 3, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 40 Joint MOTION For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Loretta Barker, Kimberly Blackmore, Danielle Ficken. Final Approval Hearing set for 7/2/14 at 10:00 am in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 2, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ficken v. New Castle Corp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle Corp
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Represented By: Elayna J Youchah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Ficken
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]