Collins v. Social Security Administration

Defendant: Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Janet M. Collins
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00613
Filed: April 10, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Defendant's Motion to Stay During Lapse in Appropriations. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a new scheduling order/briefing schedule within 7 days after lapse in appropriations is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 31, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendation. Denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting 24 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 17, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall file the complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration, US Attorney General, and the US Attorney for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Collins v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet M. Collins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]