Bundorf et al v. Salazar et al

Plaintiff: Friends of Searchlight Desert and Mountains, Ellen Ross, Basin and Range Watch, Judy Bundorf and Ronald Van Fleet, Sr.
Defendant: Ken Salazar, Bureau Of Land Management and U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Case Number: 2:2013cv00616
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for summary judgment by December 6, 2013. Federal Defendants (and intervenor if intervention is granted) shall file their response and cross-motion for summary judgment by January 17, 2013. Plaintiffs shall file their summary judgment reply by February 7, 2014. Federal Defendants (and intervenor if intervention is granted) will file their summary judgment reply by February 28, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 25, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Searchlight Wind Energy, LLC's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 13, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 12, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time and Revised Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 22, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 67 Motion to Extend Time to Respond/Reply to 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment and 53 Motion to Strike. Responses due by 5/30/2014. Replies due by 6/20/2014. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 5, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Admit Government Attorney Maureen E Rudolph for Bureau Of Land Management, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bundorf et al v. Salazar et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Searchlight Desert and Mountains
Represented By: Stacy D. Harrop
Represented By: David H. Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Ross
Represented By: Stacy D. Harrop
Represented By: David H. Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basin and Range Watch
Represented By: Stacy D. Harrop
Represented By: David H. Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Bundorf
Represented By: Stacy D. Harrop
Represented By: David H. Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Van Fleet, Sr.
Represented By: David H. Becker
Represented By: Stacy D. Harrop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Represented By: Ty Bair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau Of Land Management
Represented By: Ty Bair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: Ty Bair
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]