Strawder-McCurry v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

702) 938-1511 (fax: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
702) 446-8090 (fax: Melissa Strawder-McCurry
Case Number: 2:2013cv00618
Filed: April 10, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED. The parties are ordered, no later than June 10, 2013, to file another proposed discovery plan that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 12 Revised Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: EXTENSIONS OF DEADLINES re 15 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 27, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging 18 Order to Show Cause and Vacating Hearing set for July 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 17, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Show Cause Hearing set for 7/18/13 is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that Janet Markley is SANCTIONED in the amount of $200.00. Payment of $200.00 shall be made within ten days and Mrs. Markley shall submit proof of payment to the undersigned Judge's chambers within five days of payment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/17/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 7, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 33 Stipulation to Allow Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Leave to Disclose a Supplemental Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/07/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 10, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 35 Stipulation to Modify the Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strawder-McCurry v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 938-1511 (fax: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda H Entzminger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 446-8090 (fax: Melissa Strawder-McCurry
Represented By: Janet S. Markley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]