Moore v. Masto et al

Respondent: Renee Baker and Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto
Petitioner: Randolph L Moore
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00655
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that if necessary, petitioner shall file and serve an Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by 9/13/2013. Respondents shall have 60 days following service of the amended petition to file and serve an answer or other response to the ame nded petition. If petitioner does not file an amended petition, respondents shall have 60 days following the due-date for the amended petition to file and serve an answer or other response to the original petition which was filed on 4/18/2013. Petit ioner shall have 45 days following service of an answer to file and serve a reply. Respondents shall thereafter have 30 days following service of a reply to file and serve a response to the reply. (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 21, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Petitioner's 23 Motion to Stay and Abeyance. This action is stayed to allow petitioner to exhaust in state court, all his unexhausted claims for habeas corpus relief. By 12/15/2013 petitioner shall file and serve a status report. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date this order is entered to initiate the appropriate state court proceeding, if he has not yet done so. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 25, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 3 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Granted. The Clerk of the court shall send a copy of this order to Michael Pescetta and serve the respo ndents by certified mail with a copy of this order and a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. Respondents' counsel shall file a notice of appearance of counsel within 30 days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Michael Pescetta; mailed copies via certified mail to respondents- SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore v. Masto et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Represented By: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Adam Woodrum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Catherine Cortez Masto
Represented By: Adam Woodrum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randolph L Moore
Represented By: Michael Pescetta
Represented By: Gary Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]