Arias et al v. Prospect Mortgage, LLC

Plaintiff: Joannie Houk, Michael Lembo, Dawn Parker, Carlos Arias, Braden Bittick, Barbara Castro, Ana Maria De La Torre, Carmen De La Torre, Rosina Diaz, Melinda Escobido, Kimberly Fleischmann, David Pellegrino, Michele Weiss and Patrick Winchell
Defendant: Prospect Mortgage, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00671
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER Granting 26 Defendant Prospect Mortgage, LLC's Motion to Stay Pending Decision on Transfer. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 5, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 1, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER that 41 Motion to Stay is GRANTED. This action is stayed in its entirety pending finalization of the Parties' tentative settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/1/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER that the Court approves the settlement protocol outlined in the parties' Joint Status Report (Doc. 44 . In the event the final settlement of action is not consummated within 90 days, the parties shall, not later than October 13, 2014, file a second joint status report updating the Court on the progress of the settlement of this action. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Arias et al v. Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joannie Houk
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lembo
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Parker
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Arias
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Braden Bittick
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Castro
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria De La Torre
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen De La Torre
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosina Diaz
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Escobido
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Fleischmann
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pellegrino
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Weiss
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Winchell
Represented By: Adam W. Hansen
Represented By: Casey Andrew Landis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prospect Mortgage, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]