Ramirez v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation

Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Jorge Ramirez
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00706
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER that 1 Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to file a response in accordance with LR 7-2(d) of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 31, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Denying 16 Motion to Reconsider Order and 17 Motion for Hearing. The Clerk shall enter the amended version of the Courts 13 Order. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
December 31, 2013 22 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER that 1 Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to file a response in accordance with LR 7-2(d) of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 7, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER Granting 24 MOTION to Expunge Lis Pendens. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ramirez v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Jacob D Bundick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Ramirez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]