Archbold et al v. Landry's Gaming, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sarah Archbold, Donald Marvin and Donald L. Marvin
Defendant: Golden Nugget, Inc. and Landry's Gaming, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00714
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1693
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction / Transfer; Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 4/24/13 (sm) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 4/26/2013.]
February 14, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 20 Defendants' Motion for Scheduling Conference. Plaintiffs shall initiate a Rule 26(f) by 2/28/2014. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 5, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 14 Status Report. Defendants shall refile their Motion to Dismiss in the District of Nevada by March 26, 2014. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 9, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 34 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Each side to bear its own fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 26 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 06/09/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archbold et al v. Landry's Gaming, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Archbold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Marvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L. Marvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Rombeau
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landry's Gaming, Inc.
Represented By: Charles L. Rombeau
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]