BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP v. Advanced Funding Strategies, Inc.

Plaintiff: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP
Defendant: Advanced Funding Strategies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00722
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 22 Defendant's Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order; Denying 23 Defendant's Motion for Order to Show Cause; Denying 26 Defendant's Counter-Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs; and Denying 38 Stipulation for Extension of Time. The hearing scheduled for 1/7/2014, shall go forward as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 30, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating and Rescheduling the 2/6/2014 Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 2/14/2014 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 4, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: 48 Status Report. The parties shall have until June 18, 2014 to finalize their settlement and file the stipulation for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 7, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall have until August 30, 2014, in which to file a stipulation to dismiss or a Joint Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP v. Advanced Funding Strategies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP
Represented By: Rachel E Donn
Represented By: Marilyn Fine
Represented By: Glenn F Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Funding Strategies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.