Amareld v. Tropicana Hotel & Casino et al

Defendant: Tropicana Hotel & Casino, Armenco Holdings and Regal Entertainment Group, LLC and Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Amareld, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00758
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Denying 32 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 15, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause re 41 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 13, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 44 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 4/5/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/13/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 13, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 46 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 18, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING on 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions re Discovery, 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 1 Complaint, and 58 Defendant's Counter-Motion for Sanctions re Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2014 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 04/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
May 12, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiff shall file and serve the Amended Complaint within 7 days. The parties shall confer and, within 7 days, submit a proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 05/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amareld v. Tropicana Hotel & Casino et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Hotel & Casino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armenco Holdings and Regal Entertainment Group, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M Schulman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Amareld, Jr.
Represented By: Anjuli B Woods
Represented By: Arthur W. Tuverson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]