Switch, Ltd. v. Mainstream Advertising

Defendant: Mainstream Advertising
Plaintiff: Switch, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00781
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT and Permanent Injunction in favor of Plaintiff Switch, Ltd. and against Defendant Mainstream Advertising. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 24, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 18 Motion to Seal 17 Declaration of W. West Allen. It is granted with respect to Exhibit A, which may be filed under seal. It is denied with respect to Mr. Wests Declaration. The Clerk is directed to unseal Mr. Wests Declaration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion for Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant Mainstream Advertising in the amount of $23,376.00 and an award of $906.40, for taxable costs and $12.52 for non-taxable costs incurred by Plaintiff in the instant matter, for a total of $24,294.92 in attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 25, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Switch, Ltd. and against Mainstream Advertising in the amount of $23,376.00 and an award of $906.40, for taxable costs and $12.52 for non-taxable costs incurred by Plaintiff in the instant matter, for a total of $24,294.92 in attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Switch, Ltd. v. Mainstream Advertising
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstream Advertising
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Switch, Ltd.
Represented By: Nikkya G. Williams
Represented By: W. West Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]