Maddin, Inc. v. Allied Insurance Company of America

Defendant: Allied Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Maddin, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00827
Filed: May 13, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Denying 4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 08/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 5, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER Granting 18 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Answer. Defendant must file its amended answer within 5 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 9, 2013 29 Featured Case ORDER Denying without prejudice 28 Stipulation to Amend the Discovery Order. To the extent an extension is still required, the parties may seek one with the Court no later than 12/16/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Maddin, Inc. v. Allied Insurance Company of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Christine M. Emanuelson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maddin, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Pezzillo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]