Morales v. Oregon Mutual Insurance Company

Defendant: Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mauricio Nunez Morales
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00830
Filed: May 13, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Mauricio Nunez Morales. The parties are ordered no later than July 25, 2013 to file another proposed discovery plan that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 12 Amended Proposed Discovery Plan. The parties are ordered, no later than July 26, 2013 to file another Proposed Discovery Plan that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 15, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Counsel for both parties are to show cause in writing no later than 7/22/2013 why they failed to comply with the Local Rules as outlined in this Order. Alternatively, the filing of a joint proposed discovery plan prior to that date will suffice to discharge this order to show cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Morales v. Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Dylan P Todd
Represented By: Gordon M. Park
Represented By: Jared Green
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Nunez Morales
Represented By: Justin Patrick Stovall
Represented By: Leslie M Stovall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]