J.M. Woodworth Risk Retention Group, Inc. v. Uni-Ter Underwriting Management Corporation et al

Defendant: Uni-Ter Claims Services Corporation, Uni-Ter Risk Management Services Corporation, US RE Agencies, Inc., State of Nevada, Division of Insurance of the Department of Business and Industry and Uni-Ter Underwriting Management Corporation
Plaintiff: J.M. Woodworth Risk Retention Group, Inc.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00911
Filed: May 23, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. State of Nevada, Division of Insurance is DISMISSED from this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Uni-Ter Defendants' and US RE's Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay Action is GRANTED in part, and 25 J.M. Woodworth's Emergency Motion to Stay is DENIED. This case is STAYED pending the conclusion of the arbitration hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 Uni-Ter Defedants' and US RE's Motion to Stay Dis covery is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Motion for Leave to File Surreply is GRANTED. JMW is ordered to file a response to the Surreply within 10 days from the filing of this order. The Court will defer decision on 5 JMWs Emergency Motion to Remand until after it has had the opportunity to consider JMWs brief in this regard. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 22, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND NON-DISCLOSURE PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 27, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), and the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 68 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until April 2, 2014, to file a memorandum of points and authorities and any supporting declaration or affidavit to make a particularized showing o f good cause why the documents attached to the Uni-Ter Defendant's claim construction brief should remain under seal. The Uni-Ter Defendants' Notice of Filing Documents Under Seal 69 shall remain under seal until April 2, 2014. If Plainti ff fails to timely comply with this order, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the documents to make them available on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 72 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until April 17, 2014, to file a memorandum of points and authorities and any supporting declaration or affidavit to make a particularized showing of compelling reasons why the documents attached to Plaintiffs Supplemental Brief should remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 15, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Exhibits A, C, and D. attached to the Uni-Ter Defendants' Notice of Filing 69 shall remain under seal. The Clerk shall unseal Exhibit B to the Uni-Ter Defendants' Notice of Filing 69 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 20, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Exhibits 2 and 3 to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Remand 73 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 5, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court is GRANTED. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 12, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 90 Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 96 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1 and 3 to its Reply Brief 95 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: J.M. Woodworth Risk Retention Group, Inc. v. Uni-Ter Underwriting Management Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uni-Ter Claims Services Corporation
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uni-Ter Risk Management Services Corporation
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US RE Agencies, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada, Division of Insurance of the Department of Business and Industry
Represented By: Melissa L. Flatley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uni-Ter Underwriting Management Corporation
Represented By: Christopher R Miltenberger
Represented By: James J. Pisanelli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.M. Woodworth Risk Retention Group, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Nino
Represented By: Constance L. Akridge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]