Beell v. First National Collection Bureau, Inc.

Defendant: First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Beell
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01303
Filed: July 23, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER Granting 16 Motion to Substitute Attorney Stephanie J. Smith in place and stead of Attorneys Rex Garner and Robert R. McCoy for First National Collections Bureau, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/12/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 8, 2014 29 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by MDL M MDL on 4/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Conditional Transfer Order)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/8/2014) (SLR).
May 1, 2014 31 Featured Case PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/1/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Beell v. First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Collection Bureau, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Beell
Represented By: Marc P Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]