United States of America v. $32,750.00 in United States Currency

Defendant: $32,750.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv01329
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 30, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the government may have 10 days from the date of entry of this order to file an opposition to 7 Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: Copy to AUSA - AC)
February 11, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 2/11/2014 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 11 Order to Respond to Claim is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 11 Order is VACATED. The Court Clerk shall correct the docket entry # 7 to reflect the Verified Claim. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 14, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Strike the Computer Generated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 02/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
November 26, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for the Property as to $32,750.00 in United States Currency. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $32,750.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $32,750.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael A Humphreys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]