Greenspun et al Stephens Media, LLC et al

Defendant: SF Holding Corp., Warren A. Stephens, Michael Ferguson, DR Partners, Stephens Holding Company of Arkansas, Stephens Media Intellectual Property, LLC and Stephens Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian L. Greenspun, Brian L. Greenspun Separate Property Trust dated July 11, 1990 and Amy Greenspun Arenson 2010 Legacy Trust
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01494
Filed: August 20, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendants' 48 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 12, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting without Prejudice Plaintiffs' 101 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their motion for attorneys' fees within 30 days of the issuance of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 13, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 2 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/13/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 25, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 36 Motion for TRO and 37 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
January 27, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 65 Stipulation for Protective Order with modifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
January 27, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall comply with the requirements of LR 10-5(b), and the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 10, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 71 Motion to File Declaration of Lawrence A. Kasten Under Seal in support of 70 RENEWED MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 17, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Seal 84 Affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 20, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 88 and 93 Motions to File Affidavit Under Seal are GRANTED. The affidavits of R. Leif Reid 90 and 95 shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 27, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing re 2 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set for 9/6/2013 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Responses due by 8/30/2013. Replies due by 9/4/2013. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 08/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Greenspun et al Stephens Media, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SF Holding Corp.
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren A. Stephens
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferguson
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR Partners
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Holding Company of Arkansas
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Media Intellectual Property, LLC
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Media, LLC
Represented By: J. Colby Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L. Greenspun
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Represented By: Tara C Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian L. Greenspun Separate Property Trust dated July 11, 1990
Represented By: Tara C Zimmerman
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Greenspun Arenson 2010 Legacy Trust
Represented By: Tara C Zimmerman
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Represented By: Darren J. Lemieux
Represented By: Joseph M. Alioto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]