Montoya et al v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Laurie J. Wainwright and Debbie Montoya
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01505
Filed: August 21, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting in part 12 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has 30 days to re-file this action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs shall have until Friday, 9/20/2013 to file a new, completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis along with a complaint. Plaintiffs may make the necessary arrangements to pay the filing fee of $400 accompanied by a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 30, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 7 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff Debbie Montoya shall have until March 3, 2014 to accomplish service on Defendant and provide the Court will acceptable proof of service pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(l). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/30/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Montoya et al v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie J. Wainwright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Montoya
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]