Garden Meadow, Inc. v. Galyford (HK) Limited

Plaintiff: Sandy Cooper and Garden Meadow, Inc.
Defendant: Galyford (HK) Limited
Case Number: 2:2013cv01520
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2015 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe re 12 Emergency MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Responses due by 3/18/2015. No later than March 12, 2015, Plaintiffs' current counsel of record shall serve Plaintiffs with this order and shall file a proof of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 23, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot Plaintiffs' 12 Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Vacating the hearing set for today at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 30, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 6 Plaintiffs' Motion Enlarge Time for Service re 1 Complaint. Proof of service due by 2/13/2014. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
March 5, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time for Service. Status Report due by 8/13/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garden Meadow, Inc. v. Galyford (HK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Cooper
Represented By: L. Chrisopher Rose
Represented By: Tyler Nichols Ure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Meadow, Inc.
Represented By: L. Chrisopher Rose
Represented By: Tyler Nichols Ure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galyford (HK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.