Long v. Torres Credit Services, Inc.

Defendant: Torres Credit Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kathryn Long
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01531
Filed: August 23, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 19 Featured Case ORDER Granting 16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Radius Solutions, Inc. answer due 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 30, 2014 22 Featured Case ORDER Granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 5, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER re 18 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Status Report due by 11/14/2014. Status Check set for 11/21/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/5/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 18, 2014 33 Featured Case ORDER that this case is stayed pending the Stipulation and Order for Dismissal. FURTHER ORDERED that the Stipulation and Order for Dismissal must be filed on or before May 19, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Long v. Torres Credit Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torres Credit Services, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Long
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]