Turner v. High Desert State Prison et al

Defendant: Nevada Inmate Bank System, Nevada Department of Corrections, High Desert State Prison and State of Nevada
Plaintiff: John Turner
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01740
Filed: September 23, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 4 , 7 , 9 , 10 , 11 , and 13 Plaintiff's Motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send plaintiff a printout of the current CM/ECF docket in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit no further motions or documents during the 90-day mediation stay. Plaintiff is hereby cautioned that any motions or documents filed during this stay will be stricken as fugitive documents. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: plaintiff - EDS)
January 23, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Striking 17 Plaintiff's Motion/Request for the Production of Documents and Denying as moot 20 Plaintiff's Second Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further motions, pleadings, or documents filed by Plaintiff during the 90-day mediation stay SHALL BE STRICKEN by the Court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 01/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 15, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerk's Office and to the Chief of Inmate Services for the Nevada Department of Correc tions. Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this order and 15 plaintiff's complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. If the Attorney General accepts service, answer or other response due within 60 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 27, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 38 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 21, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 49 Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit. Plaintiff's fund is increased an additional $30.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 11, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 52 Turner's Motion Requesting Issuance of a Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
September 2, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying without prejudice 64 Plaintiff John Turner's Request to return copies of his grievance report and orientation booklet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Turner v. High Desert State Prison et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Inmate Bank System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Turner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]