U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Mattress Firm, Inc.

213) 894-1301 (fax: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01745
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying as moot 26 Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 Motion to Quash is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 16, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. IT IS SO ORDERED that the terms of this Protective Order shall govern the production of Confidential Information, as defined herein, for the above-captioned litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 22, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay. The 6 Court's stay issued on 10/1/2013 is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Mattress Firm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
213) 894-1301 (fax: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth A Naccarato
Represented By: Anna Park
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattress Firm, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]