Jasic v. Kara

Plaintiff: Edita Jasic
Defendant: Mary Kara
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01747
Filed: September 24, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER Granting 3 Plaintiff's Second Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint. The Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice with leave to amend. P laintiff will have 30 days to file an Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Counsel (#3-1, 3) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
December 3, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER that the 5 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file an Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 1/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/03/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
February 13, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER Accepting 7 Report and Recommendation. Bradfords complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Jasic v. Kara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edita Jasic
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]