Smart City Holdings, LLC et al v. Shownets, LLC et al

Counter Defendant: Smart City Holdings, LLC and Smart City Networks, L.P.
Defendant: Shownets, LLC and Scott Nussbaum
Counter Claimant: Shownets, LLC
Plaintiff: Smart City Holdings, LLC and Smart City Networks, L.P.
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv01751
Filed: September 24, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Referring Judge: George Foley
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 104 Joint Motion to Vacate the Status Conference set for 04:00 PM 7/17/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 25, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order shall go into effect upon Plaintiffs' posting of a bond in the amount of $100.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be set by the Court upon the conclusion of the briefing on the motion, or as otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 2, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Discovery in Connection with Preliminary Injunction Motion filed by Smart City Holdings, LLC, Smart City Networks, L.P. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery conducted in this matter shall be governed by a protective order regarding the dissemination of confidential and highly confidential/attorneys eyes only information. The parties shall expeditiously submit a stipulated proposed protective order to the Court for approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/2/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 10, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 6, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 60 Motion to Seal. Defendant Nussbaum shall file an unsealed copy of 61 Motion to Dismiss within 5 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 65 Motion to Seal is granted in part and denied in part. Plainti ff's shall file an unsealed copy of 66 MOTION to Dismiss within 5 days of this order. Plaintiffs shall file unsealed and redacted copies of the exhibits to 66 Motion to Dismiss along with a sealed explanation setting forth adequate reasons for any redaction. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 18, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smart City Holdings, LLC et al v. Shownets, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Smart City Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: Jessie B. Mishkin
Represented By: Alvin William Maupin
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Marla J Hudgens
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Represented By: Kimberly Rosensteel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Smart City Networks, L.P.
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Represented By: Marla J Hudgens
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Alvin William Maupin
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: Jessie B. Mishkin
Represented By: Kimberly Rosensteel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shownets, LLC
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: Sarah A. Harmon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Nussbaum
Represented By: Carbajal & McNutt, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shownets, LLC
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Represented By: Sarah A. Harmon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart City Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Represented By: Marla J Hudgens
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Alvin William Maupin
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: Jessie B. Mishkin
Represented By: Kimberly Rosensteel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart City Networks, L.P.
Represented By: Paul R. Hejmanowski
Represented By: Marla J Hudgens
Represented By: Christopher Mathews
Represented By: Alvin William Maupin
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: Jessie B. Mishkin
Represented By: Kimberly Rosensteel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]