Diaz v. Lee et al

Defendant: Lee and Strad Line
Plaintiff: Carlos Cortez Diaz
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv02351
Filed: December 27, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 2 Featured Case ORDER that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until Wednesday, March 12, 2014 to a new application proceed in forma pauperis, accompanied by a signed financial certificate and certified copy of his prisoner trust fund account for the previous six months. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: ifp form to pltf - MMM)
March 24, 2014 4 Featured Case ORDER that 3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until Friday, April 25, 2014 to file a new application proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank ifp form to Plaintiff - MMM)
June 4, 2014 6 Featured Case ORDER that 5 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's case is DISMISSED without prejudice and the Clerk is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Diaz v. Lee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strad Line
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cortez Diaz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]