Kamedula v. Dixon et al

Defendant: Todd Dixon and Kathy Ann King
Plaintiff: Brian Kamedula
Case Number: 3:2010cv00749
Filed: December 2, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff has thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file his amended complaint, in conformance with this court's 3 Screening Order. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff is expressly warned that failure to file an amended complaint will result in the dismissal of this entire action. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff's 8 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED as moot. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/23/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
April 6, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for Judge to rule on Objection to Magistrate's Screening Order 14 is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's Objection to Screening Order 5 is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is given an extension to file his amended complaint. He shall file his amended complaint, if any, within thirty (30) days of entry of this Order.(Amended Complaint deadline: 5/6/2011.) Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 4/6/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
May 24, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTH ORD that P's 17 motion for judgment on the complaint is DENIED. FURTH ORD that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
May 24, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
June 8, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that this court CERTIFIES that any in forma pauperis appeal from its Order dated May 24, 2011 (docket # 19 ) would not be taken "in good faith" pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3); Re: 24 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 6/8/2011. ( E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit on 6/9/2011 re USCA Case Number 11-16349 ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamedula v. Dixon et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dixon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Ann King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kamedula
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]