Ferring B.V. v. Apotex, Inc. et al

Counter Defendant: Ferring B.V.
Plaintiff: Ferring B.V.
Counter Claimant: Apotex, Inc. and Apotex Corp.
Defendant: Apotex, Inc. and Apotex Corp.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00854
Filed: November 25, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Claim Construction : The disputed terms are construed as specified herein. ( See order for specifics. ) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/6/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 11, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 265 Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order ( filed in case 3:11-cv-00481 ) are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 28, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 313 Motion to Amend is GRANTED. FURTHER ORD that the # 321 Motion to Amend is DENIED. FURTHER ORD that the Motions to Seal (## 312 , 322 , 327 ) are GRANTED. (Referenced doc. nos. filed in base case 3:11-cv-00481) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/28/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 24, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Motions filed in Base Case 3:11-cv-00481 : ORDERED that the Motions to Seal (ECF Nos. 462 , 464 , 467 , 471 , 476 , 478 , 480 , 482 , 485 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Stay (ECF No. 463 ), the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 465 ), and the Motions to Strike (ECF Nos. 474 , 477 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 24, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT 1. This action is dismissed pursuant to the stipulation of Apotex made on the record and incorporated by reference and filed under seal. 2. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorneys/ fees. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ferring B.V. v. Apotex, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ferring B.V.
Represented By: Justin J. Bustos
Represented By: Justin J Hasford
Represented By: James B Monroe
Represented By: Molly Malone Rezac
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferring B.V.
Represented By: Justin J. Bustos
Represented By: Justin J Hasford
Represented By: James B Monroe
Represented By: Molly Malone Rezac
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Apotex, Inc.
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Robert Gould
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Represented By: Brian A. Neighbarger
Represented By: Richard T Ruzich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Brian A. Neighbarger
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Represented By: Robert Gould
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Richard T Ruzich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex, Inc.
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Robert Gould
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Represented By: Brian A. Neighbarger
Represented By: Richard T Ruzich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Dominica C. Anderson
Represented By: Robert Gould
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Represented By: Brian A. Neighbarger
Represented By: Richard T Ruzich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]