United States of America v. $16,978.29 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $16,978.29 in United States Currency
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00425
Filed: August 13, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Strike 9 Answer. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 29, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Claim. The Clerk shall file Mark Enriquez's Verified Claim. Mr. Enriquez's answer or response to the Complaint due 9/19/2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 21, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Strike 23 Claim. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 20, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America against $16,978.29 in United States Currency. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $16,978.29 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,978.29 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]