Curitti et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: CJT Financial Group and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Maria Curitti and Matthew Curitti
Case Number: 3:2012cv00442
Filed: August 17, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT against CJT Financial Group. Motion for Default Judgment 96 is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 15, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 95 Stipulation to Release Funds, Vacate Order, Enter Judgment Quieting Title As Against JPMorgan Chse Bank, N.A., and Dismiss Claims With Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/15/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 7, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for Attorney Fees. Expenses awarded in amount of $3707.35 (see attached for distribution details). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 9, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 92 Notice of Withdrawal. Attorney Rick R. Hsu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 07/09/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curitti et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJT Financial Group
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kent F Larsen
Represented By: Katie M. Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Curitti
Represented By: Joan C Wright
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Curitti
Represented By: Ryan D. Russell
Represented By: Joan C Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]