United States of America v. Pflum et al

Defendant: David G. Pflum, Patricia A. Pflum, Patrick Palmeri as Trustee for the Little Flower Security Trust, Carson City, City of and Margaret Palmeri as Trustee for the Little Flower Security Trust
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00507
Filed: September 20, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Strike. David and Patricia Pflum have 14 days to file a proper response to the Complaint or to show cause why the Court should not grant the 21 Motion for Default Judgment. (Response due 9/9/2013.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/26/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 22, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 22, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale re 21 -2 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 18, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONFIRMATION OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS granting 45 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. The sale of the subject property is hereby confirmed. The IRS shall issue a deed for the property. The Clerk shall distribute the sale proceeds as follows (see order for details). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and also to Finance Department - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Pflum et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Pflum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia A. Pflum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Palmeri as Trustee for the Little Flower Security Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson City, City of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Palmeri as Trustee for the Little Flower Security Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Represented By: Nathaniel B Parker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]