Hughes v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Defendant: Kathryn L. Burke, Federal National Mortgage Association, Recontrust Company, N.A., Washoe County Recorders Office, Bank of America, N.A., BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP and Bank of America Corporation
Plaintiff: Gregory Hughes
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00513
Filed: September 21, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 , 10 , 11 , 13 , 14 , and 16 Motions. FURTHER ORDERED that all claims except the first, sixth, seventh, and thirteenth are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 17, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Kathryn Burke is DISMISSED as a defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 10, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 48 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE by 1/24/2014 why the claims should not be dismissed as against the Recorder. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED # 62 Motion for sanctions is DENIED. FURTHER ORD # 67 Motion for permission to appeal and ## 68 , 74 Motion to stay are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORD # 69 Motion to waive appeal fees is DENIED for lack of jurisdiction. FURTHER ORD the remaining parties are DISMISSED, and Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 16, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 6/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hughes v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn L. Burke
Represented By: Herbert B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe County Recorders Office
Represented By: Herbert B. Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hughes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]