Adkins v. Cox et al

Defendant: Barrare, Blemore, Brown, Byrne, Corroll, James G. Cox, Fikes, Hazit, Holman, Irving, Johnson, D. Johnson, Renee Baker, Adams, E.K. McDaniel, Stubbs and Zimmerman
Plaintiff: Frederick W. Adkins
Case Number: 3:2012cv00581
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1 is GRANTED. Monthly payments due until filing fee paid in full (copies of order sent via NEF to finance and via mail to chief of inmate services). Clerk shall serve copy of order and copy of complaint on AG's Office, attn Kat Howe (sent via NEF/NEF regeneration 5/2/13). AG's Office to notify court within 21 days with respect to service (see attached for details). Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings. Motion to Correct 6 is GRANTED. Clerk shall replace defednant Hazit with Hazelitt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 2, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's # 16 Motion identifying unserved defendants and requesting issuance of summons is GRANTED in part. The Clerk shall ISSUE summonses for Alan Zimmer and Jonathan Kluever and send the same to the USM with the addresses provid ed under seal (#s 15 & 17). The Clerk shall SEND to plaintiff two USM-285 forms, two copies of the complaint (#4), and two copies of this order for the defendants. Plaintiff shall have until Friday, July 19, 2013 to complete the USM-285 service forms and return them along with the other documents to the USM for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 17, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/17/2013, GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 29 Motion to Extend Time; GRANTING IN PART Plaintiff's 31 / 33 Motion to Extend Copywork Limit. Plaintiff shall h ave to and including Friday, August 30, 2013 to file an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. No further extensions of time shall be granted. The court will allow plaintiff a one-time opportunity to exceed his photocopy limit in the additional amount of $10 in order to properly oppose defendants' motion to dismiss. The court will not allow plaintiff to exceed the copy limit by more than $10 under any circumstance. The Clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Albert Peralta, Chief of Inmate Services for NDOC, P.O. Box 7011, Carson City, Nevada 89702. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 5, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Magistrate Judge's # 50 Order is sustained and Plaintiff's # 51 Objection, treated as a motion to reconsider, is denied. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 6, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and accepting 82 Report and Recommendation and dismissing this action for Plaintiff's fraud on the court; denying as moot 21 , 30 , 42 , 56 , 65 , 69 , 75 , and 79 motions. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Cox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrare
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blemore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byrne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corroll
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fikes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazit
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stubbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W. Adkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]