Dean v. Palmer

Plaintiff: Travis Remaul Dean
Defendant: Jack Palmer
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00658
Filed: December 17, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 6 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel, 8 Motion for Certificate of Appealability, and 16 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; and denying without prejud ice 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff shall file amended complaint within 30 days. Clerk shall send to plaintiff blank complaint form with instructions (sent 8/21/13). (E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 28, 2014 26 Featured Case ORDER denying 25 motion for service by the Marshal. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 2, 2014 30 Featured Case ORDER Following plaintiff's abandonment of amended complaint 23 filed on 1/24/2014, said amended complaint shall be stricken. Plaintiff's extant amended complaint 21 is dismissed, subject to opportunity to amend. P laintiff shall have 30 days to file amended complaint. Plaintiff's pending motions 28 and 29 are denied. Clerk shall send plaintiff two copies of complaint form with copy of instructions and 21 amended complaint (sent 6/3/2014). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 28, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Clerk shall send plaintiff approved forms for filing civil rights lawsuits and application to proceed IFP with instructions (forms sent 1/28/13). Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dean v. Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Remaul Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Palmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]