Vonslochteren v. Bain Lee et al

Defendant: William Scott Lee, A.V. Carriers Corporation, Cecilie Bain Lee and Gildardo Garcia
Plaintiff: Michael A. Vonslochteren
Case Number: 3:2012cv00663
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 43 Letter for status check. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 14, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Liability. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 28, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice per 53 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vonslochteren v. Bain Lee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Scott Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.V. Carriers Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilie Bain Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gildardo Garcia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Vonslochteren
Represented By: Bernard Q. Phelan
Represented By: Richard Anthony Salvatore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]