Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Goldman Sachs Palmetto State Credit Fund, L.P. et al

Appellee: Sphere Capital, LLC - Series B, Wazee Street Capital Management, LLC, Nomura Corporate Research & Asset Management, Inc., Liberty Harbor Master Fund I, L.P., Goldman Sachs Palmetto State Credit Fund, L.P., Feingold O'Keefe Capital, LLC, Del Mar Master Fund Ltd. and Och-Ziff Capital Management Group
Creditor: Kubota Tractor Corporation and Bank of America Corporation NA
Appellant: Ahern Rentals, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00676
Filed: December 20, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Stay. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
January 14, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Appellee's 30 Motion to vacate the stay and dismiss the appeal for lack of jurisdiction is GRANTED. The court's 5 21 orders staying the bankruptcy are VACATED. FURTHER ORD that this action is DISMISSED. FURTHER ORD that appellant-debtor's 56 Motion to exceed the page limits is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
January 23, 2013 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 65 Motion to Stay pending appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/23/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Goldman Sachs Palmetto State Credit Fund, L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sphere Capital, LLC - Series B
Represented By: Robert M. Charles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wazee Street Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Laurel E. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nomura Corporate Research & Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: David Ball
Represented By: Robert G. Burns
Represented By: Daniel S Connolly
Represented By: Laurel E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel B Goldman
Represented By: Kurt Mayr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liberty Harbor Master Fund I, L.P.
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Represented By: Haig M. Maghakian
Represented By: Robert Jay Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Goldman Sachs Palmetto State Credit Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Represented By: Haig M. Maghakian
Represented By: Robert Jay Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Feingold O'Keefe Capital, LLC
Represented By: David Ball
Represented By: Robert G. Burns
Represented By: Daniel S Connolly
Represented By: Laurel E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel B Goldman
Represented By: Kurt Mayr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Del Mar Master Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel S Connolly
Represented By: Robert G. Burns
Represented By: David Ball
Represented By: Laurel E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel B Goldman
Represented By: Kurt Mayr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Och-Ziff Capital Management Group
Represented By: David Ball
Represented By: Robert G. Burns
Represented By: Daniel S Connolly
Represented By: Laurel E. Davis
Represented By: Rachel B Goldman
Represented By: Kurt Mayr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Kubota Tractor Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Zmaila
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Bank of America Corporation NA
Represented By: Janine C Prupas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ahern Rentals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Represented By: William M. Noall
Represented By: Gabrielle A. Hamm
Represented By: Gerald M. Gordon
Represented By: Gregg M. Galardi
Represented By: Thomas H. Fell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]