Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Marini et al

Movant: Big Sky Venture Capital III LLC, Big Sky Venture Capital IV LLC and Greenhouse Capital Partners LP
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Respondent: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Defendant: Noventi LLC, Noventi Ventures II LP and Giacomo Marini
In Re: Windspire Energy Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00010
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2013 133 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING the parties' 132 Joint Motion. The parties shall have up to and including July 19, 2013 to file their case management report, which report may be extended to 20 pages in length. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 07/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 1, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 , 3 and 7 Motions to Withdraw Reference to the extent that all claims are withdrawn, and granting 18 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/1/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 10, 2013 241 Featured Case MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Alan J. Stomel (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Cynthia Alexander, Kaaran Thomas, Timothy Rowe, David Schwartz, Lisa Chapman (Telephonically); FTR #: 10:33:54 a.m. - 11:20:43 a.m.; Time of Hearing: 10:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. The court holds today's hearing to address Plaintiff's 220 Motion for Stay. The court advises the parties that it will treat Plaintiffs Motion for Stay as a request for stay of discovery; therefore, for the purpose of this hearing, Plaintiffs Motion for Stay will be addressed in the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. The court hears from counsel with regard to their respective positions concerning Plaintiffs motion for stay. Plaintiffs 220 Emergency Motion for Stay is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 18, 2013 258 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 244 Motion to Compel (see order for details). The discovery deadline is VACATED only with respect to Noventi's second request for production of documents. All other discovery will close as s cheduled on November 22, 2013. The dispositive motion deadline of December 20, 2013 is VACATED. A status conference will be held on December 10, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 10, 2014 269 Featured Case ORDERED the ## 40 , 52 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED the # 105 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 21, 2014 270 Featured Case Amended ORDER re 269 Order denying Motions to Dismiss 40 and 52 , denying Motion for Summary Judgment, denying Motion for Joinder, and denying 171 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Marini et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Big Sky Venture Capital III LLC
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Represented By: David H. Schwartz
Represented By: John P. Kreis
Represented By: Brian R. Irvine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Big Sky Venture Capital IV LLC
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Represented By: John P. Kreis
Represented By: David H. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian R. Irvine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Greenhouse Capital Partners LP
Represented By: Matthew C Zirzow
Represented By: David H. Schwartz
Represented By: John P. Kreis
Represented By: Brian R. Irvine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Jason D. Maynard
Represented By: Bryan W. Dillion
Represented By: Steven P Handelin
Represented By: Alan J. Stomel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Jason D. Maynard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noventi LLC
Represented By: Kaaran E Thomas
Represented By: Kaaran E Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noventi Ventures II LP
Represented By: Kaaran E Thomas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giacomo Marini
Represented By: Cynthia Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Windspire Energy Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Irvine
Represented By: Alan R Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]