VFS Financing, Inc. v. Gonfiantini et al

Plaintiff: VFS Financing, Inc.
Defendant: Zucchero, LLC, The Stacey L. Gonfiantini Trust Dated May 6, 2006, The Nello Gonfiantini, III, 1981 Trust, Dated June 11, 1981, Stacey L. Gonfiantini, Nello Gonfiantini, III, Stacey Gonfiantini as Beneficiary of the Stacey L. Gonfiantini Trust Dated May 6, 2006 and Stacey Gonfiantini as Trustee of the Stacey L. Gonfiantini Trust Dated May 6, 2006
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00109
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/6/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 18, 2013 82 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 11/18/2013, granting 80 Motion to Seal. The 81 joint case management report is filed and shall remain under seal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 22, 2013 84 Featured Case ORDER - Defendant SHALL PROVIDE a Supplemental Response to RFA No. 29 on or before Monday, November 25, 2013 at Noon PST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: VFS Financing, Inc. v. Gonfiantini et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VFS Financing, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew F. Dixon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zucchero, LLC
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stacey L. Gonfiantini Trust Dated May 6, 2006
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Nello Gonfiantini, III, 1981 Trust, Dated June 11, 1981
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey L. Gonfiantini
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nello Gonfiantini, III
Represented By: Mark H. Gunderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Gonfiantini as Beneficiary of the Stacey L. Gonfiantini Trust Dated May 6, 2006
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Gonfiantini as Trustee of the Stacey L. Gonfiantini Trust Dated May 6, 2006
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]