Howard v. Baker et al

Defendant: Renee Baker, Bruce Bannister, Nurse Brewer, Michael Koehn and E K McDaniel
Plaintiff: Samuel Howard
Case Number: 3:2013cv00163
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED THAT : P's # 1 IFP Application is GRANTED, however P must pay initial partial filing fee of $78.45 by 3/27/2014; Clerk shall SEND P 2 copies this order. (Mailed 2/25/2014) P shall arrange return of 1 copy with payment; NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account; Clerk shall SEND copy this order to Finance and NDOC Inmate Services; (E-service to Finance; mailed to NDOC on 2/25/2014.); The stay is lifted, and AG shall file a notice re acceptance of service by 3/18/2014, and file under seal addresses of Ds for which service not accepted; P shall file a motion identifying Ds for which service not accepted. If AG accepts service for any named D, then answer/response due by 4/25/2013. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 20, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING # 30 Motion for reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2015 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and accepting in its entirety 53 Report and Recommendation; granting Defendants' 36 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 42 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing Clerk to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E K McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.