Odoms v. NDOC Utilization Review Panel et al

Defendant: Bruce Bannister, Marsha Johns, Director of Nursing, NDOC Utilization Review Panel, James Cox and Karen Gedney
Plaintiff: J. Benjamin Odoms
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00193
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER - The Court certifies to the Court of Appeals that the # 7 Notice of Appeal is not taken in good faith. Re: 9th Cir. Case 13-16459. The Clerk of Court shall: (a) prominently reflect this certification in bold in the docket entry for this order; and (b) forward a notice of electronic filing to the Court of Appeals (Emailed NEF to 9th Cir. on 8/22/2013.) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/21/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 16, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Motion for Relief from Order. Clerk shall send plaintiff with this order copy of: (a) docket sheet and complaint in 3:13-cv-00181; (b) docket sheet and complaint in this action, 3:13-cv-00193; and (c) docket sheet in 3:09-cv-00223 (all documents sent 9/17/13). This action remains closed. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 9, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice as duplicative to 3:13-cv-00181-RCJ-WGC. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Odoms v. NDOC Utilization Review Panel et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bannister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Johns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Nursing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC Utilization Review Panel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gedney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Benjamin Odoms
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]