Smith v. Homes et al

Plaintiff: Willie Smith
Defendant: C. Burson, Homes and Brian E. William
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00202
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion : the Clerk shall issue a Summons for D Cheryl Burson and send the same to the USM with the address provided under seal. (Doc. # 12 .) (Summons to USM on 12/31/2013.) FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send P a USM-285 form, a copy of the # 6 Complaint, and a copy of this Order. (Mailed to P 12/31/2013.) FURTHER ORDERED P shall have until 1/20/2014 to complete the USM-285 form and return it along with other necessary documents to the USM for service. P shall thereafter file a Notice informing court of status of that service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/31/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 5, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 2/5/2014, denying 29 Motion to Stay. The courtroom deputy shall schedule a hearing on Defendants' 13 motion for change of venue as soon as the court's calendar will accommodate it. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Willie Smith, Pro Se (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Raelene K. Palmer (Telephonic ally); FTR #: 9:58:51 a.m. - 10:29:34 a.m.. Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' 13 Motion for Change of Venue is DENIED without prejudice. Should this matter survive dispositive motions and the matter appears to be headed toward trial, the court entertain and reconsider a new motion for change of venue. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
June 10, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING without prejudice Plaintiff's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall send to plaintiff a form and instruction for filing an application to proceed in forma pauperis (mailed 6/11/2013). Plai ntiff shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order to file a complete in forma pauperis application, including the financial affidavit and account records. Failure to timely file the application or pay the full $350 filing fee may result in this action being dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 06/10/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 28, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 2, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff has additional 45 days to serve Ms. Burson. (Proof of service re: Ms. Burson due by 7/17/2014.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 25, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 6/25/2014, denying Defendants' 58 Motion to Strike. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 7, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 56 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 23, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice as to C. Burson. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Smith v. Homes et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Burson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. William
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]