The 24-7 Group of Companies, Inc. v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: The 24-7 Group of Companies, Inc.
Defendant: Terry Roberts, Melanie Roberts and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00211
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss Fourth Claim for Relief (see pdf order for specifics). Amended Complaint deadline: 1/27/2014. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 15, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Phillip M. Stone withdrawn from the case obo The 24-7 Group. Plaintiff, The 24-7 Group of Companies,Inc., shall procure replacement counsel by 8/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)(Copy mailed to to P at address specified herein.)
August 21, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Vacate. Clerk directed to mail this order, counsel's motion 36 and the order granting the motion 37 to Kraft/24-7 at address listed on request (mailed 8/21/14). Telephonic status conference set for < B>Friday, 9/5/14, at 1:30 p.m. to allow Mr. Kraft to show cause why a report and recommendation should not be entered recommending dismissal of this action. Parties wishing to appear telephonically shall dial 1-877-873-8017, enter the access code 3416460, and enter the security code 91514 approximately five minutes prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 10, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Demand to Void Motion and Related Order Due to Fraud upon the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 8, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The 24-7 Group of Companies, Inc. v. Roberts et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The 24-7 Group of Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Del L Hardy
Represented By: Stephanie R. Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Scott S. Hoffmann
Represented By: Paul A. Matteoni
Represented By: Tara C Zimmerman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]