McDonald v. Olivas et al

Defendant: Allen, Ball, R. Bannister, Bennet, Quentin Byrne, James G. Cox, Karen Gedney, Goolsby, Harris, Marsha Johns, Robert LeGrand, Marrs, Shannon Moyle, Mullins, Nevada Dept. of Correction, Olivas, Poag, William Sandie, Dr. John Scott and Lisa Walsh
Plaintiff: Reginald McDonald
Case Number: 3:2013cv00240
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 96 Motion to Address Matters Related to Blank Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 18, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that # 12 Motion for an extension of the mediation stay is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the stay in this action is extended until February 27, 2014. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants SHALL FILE the status report, in compliance with the screening order, not later than February 27, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 4, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 12/4/2014, granting 108 motion to supplement exhibits and directing the courtroom administrator to calendar a discovery hearing to address motion to compel 103 and motion to request extension of discovery 132 . Please see attached for additional details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 4, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 141 "motion to inform" and denying the component seeking sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 23, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS regarding 156 Minutes of Proceedings. Status Conference held on 3/23/2015 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: No Appearance; Def Counsel: Benjamin Joh nson (Telephonically); FTR #: FTR; Time of Hearing: 1:35:16 p.m. - 1:39:06 p.m.; Courtroom: 2. There is no appearance on behalf of Plaintiff. In view of Mr. McDonald's failure to appear for today's hearing, the December 19, 2014, hearing (D oc. # 148 ) and the court also receiving mail returned as undeliverable (Doc. # 155 ), the court will be submitting a report and recommendation to District Judge Miranda M. Du recommending this case be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The deadlines to file dispositive motion(s) and the joint pretrial order remain vacated pending resolution of the anticipated report and recommendation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
May 11, 2015 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - # 158 R&R is accepted and adopted in its entirety. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 6, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 Motion to Extend Time; granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff shall submit (not file) his confidential mediation statement not later than 2/18/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 02/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting # 10 Motion to supplement list of defendants. Clerk shall add following defendants to docket : Dave Everette, Candis Brockway, Ms. Simmons, Ms. Feil, Mr. Humphrey, Terri Jacobs, Law Library Supervisor, Mail Room Supervisor, and Wendy. Further ordered that # 16 Motion for reconsideration of order denying appointment of counsel is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 27, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 IFP application. Payment of an initial installment of he filing fee not required. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerks Office (NEF sent 2/27/2014) and the NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (mailed 2/27/2014). The Clerk shall serve this order and 4 complaint on NV AG's Office, Attn: Kat Howe (NEFs sent 2/27/2014). AG to advise court within 21 days regarding servic e (by 3/20/2014). Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 02/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff will have 20 days from entry of this order to resubmit his complaint, ensuring that all pages, including the one identified as missing, are properly imaged and transmitted (due by 10/20/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 09/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 16, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 5/16/2014, denying as moot 47 Motion to Inquire. (Attachments: # 1 Doc. #41) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 14, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Parties to meet and confer to try to ascertain identities of John Doe Psychologist, Mail Room Supervisor and Law Library Supervisor. Statement indicating whether or not these defendants have been identified due within 30 days. If any ha ve been identified, AG's Office to indicate whether service will be accepted on their behalf. Motion to Correct and Motion to Request Court Orders 56 is denied. Motion to Quash 54 is granted. Plaintiff has additional 45 days to serve Mr. Harris and Mr. Goolsby. Plaintiff's requests for unrestricted access to medical records, to have NNCC staff interpret or transcribe medical record entries, for unrestricted access to law library and to have all legal questions ans wered are denied. Defendants shall assure that Plaintiff is afforded reasonable amount of time to review his medical records. Please see attached for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 14, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Request Permission for an Expansion to Defendant Cesar Olivas Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 14, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 , 55 , and 57 67 Motions for Issuance of Subpoenas. Clerk directed to issue 11 blank subpoenas to Plaintiff. Plaintiff directed to fill out subpoenas and return them within 30 day s. If any subpoenas require the attendance and testimony of a witness, Plaintiff required to submit applicable witness fees. The court will then transmit subpoenas and accompanying fees to US Marshal for service. Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) Modified on 7/14/2014 to reflect correct reference to 67 . (BLG).
August 4, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re # 81 Motion : P's request for permission to supplement defendants is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; AG's shall also ensure Plaintiff has a reasonable opportunity to view any case documents maintained in the Warden's Office; the remaining components of P's Motion will be addressed at a subsequent status conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 19, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Clerk shall return the eleven subpoenas (ref 71 Order) and issue eleven new blank subpoenas (issued and sent to plaintiff via US Mail 8/20/14). Plaintiff directed to fill out subpoenas, including full name and address of each intended recipient, to indicate whether he intends to conduct oral deposition or deposition by written questions or seek production of documents, electronically stored information or objects. Plaintiff must return completed subpoenas withi n 21 days. If Plaintiff intends to command the appearance of the witness to testify, he must submit the required witness fees along with the completed subpoenas or the court will not forward them on to the United States Marshal's Offic e for service. If Plaintiff only seeks the production of documents, he is not required to tender any witness fees; however, he is required to include an attachment setting forth, with specificity, the documents sought. Please see attached for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 20, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's oral motion to withdraw his motion is GRANTED and the # 72 Motion to appeal order is WITHDRAWN. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Olivas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Gedney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goolsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Dept. of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sandie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald McDonald
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.