RJT Whelchel Development Company LLC v. Whelchel Mines Company et al

Defendant: Elizabeth Ann Whelchel, Anita Whelchel, The Estates of Ralph Arthur Whelchel and Thressa Mae Eva Whelchel, John A Whelchel, Timothy A Whelchel and Whelchel Mines Company
Plaintiff: RJT Whelchel Development Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00242
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 15 Motion to Intervene is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion to Amend - the 18 Judgment is vacated; denying 23 Motion to Intervene. Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days why the case should not be dismissed (Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2014). Defendants and Petitioners may respond seven days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 02/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 15, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Stipulated JUDGMENT re 44 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 17, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Whelchel Mines Company. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 19, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RJT Whelchel Development Company LLC v. Whelchel Mines Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Ann Whelchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Whelchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estates of Ralph Arthur Whelchel and Thressa Mae Eva Whelchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Whelchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy A Whelchel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whelchel Mines Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RJT Whelchel Development Company LLC
Represented By: John P Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.