Pro Se Services Inc et al v. A&A Auto Wrecking LLC et al

Appellant: Maria Espinoza, Pro Se Services Inc and Steve Espinoza
Appellee: Liza Coronado, Arnulfo Coronado and A&A Auto Wrecking LLC
In Re: A&A Auto Wrecking LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00244
Filed: May 8, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Emergency Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 5, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Appellant's 21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/05/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 28, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk to serve copy of Order on BK Court within seven days (sent via USPS 1/29/14) and such service constitutes mandate. Clerk instructed to close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pro Se Services Inc et al v. A&A Auto Wrecking LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Maria Espinoza
Represented By: Mark G Simons
Represented By: Gordon Robert Goolsby
Represented By: Janet L. Chubb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pro Se Services Inc
Represented By: Mark G Simons
Represented By: Gordon Robert Goolsby
Represented By: Janet L. Chubb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Steve Espinoza
Represented By: Janet L. Chubb
Represented By: Gordon Robert Goolsby
Represented By: Mark G Simons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liza Coronado
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Chris D. Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arnulfo Coronado
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Chris D. Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: A&A Auto Wrecking LLC
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Chris D. Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: A&A Auto Wrecking LLC
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Chris D. Nichols
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]