Olausen v. Murguia et al

Defendant: Sgt. Wagner and Sgt. Murguia
Plaintiff: S. John Olausen
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00388
Filed: July 23, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking documents 8 , 9 , 10 , 13 , and 14 . Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 01/08/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 24, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 3/24/2014, denying 19 motion for offense collateral estoppel issue preclusion; denying 20 motion to stay; and denying 23 motion to compel. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 29, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING # 41 Motion to stay pending appeal; and reconsideration is also DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 5, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 6/5/2014, denying 44 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff's opposition to 31 Motion to Dismiss due by 6/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 15, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and accepting 45 Report and Recommendation; denying Plaintiff's 16 Motion for TRO; denying Plaintiff's 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 2, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 10/2/2014, rescinding in its entirety as moot 65 R&R; denying as moot 49 , 64 , 69 , 70 , 72 , 74 , 75 , and 76 motions. Re 73 motion for leave to amend, response due 10/17/2014; reply due 10/27/2014. See order for further details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 20, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 88 Motion to Stay. If defendants oppose plaintiff's motion to amend, they shall file such opposition no later than Wednesday, October 22, 2014. Otherwise, plaintiff's motion to amend will be granted as unopposed and the case will proceed on the amended complaint as prepared by plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Olausen v. Murguia et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Wagner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Murguia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. John Olausen
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]