Unwired Planet LLC v. Square, Inc

Plaintiff: Unwired Planet LLC
Defendant: Square, Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00579
Filed: October 20, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Transfer and denying 29 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 13, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFICATION TO DISCOVERY PLAN & SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC. # 47 ). ( See pdf order for specifics ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 17, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Unwired Planet LLC's # 64 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 3, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 71 Motion to Stay is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the # 76 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the disputed terms are CONSTRUED as specified herein. (See pdf order for specifics) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unwired Planet LLC v. Square, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unwired Planet LLC
Represented By: Ryan James Cudnik
Represented By: Matthew D Francis
Represented By: Jason Evan Gettleman
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Brett Michael Schuman
Represented By: Adam K Yowell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, Inc
Represented By: W. West Allen
Represented By: Theodore J. Angelis
Represented By: Douglas B. Greenswag
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]